Financial history FRIENDS OF ST MICHAEL'S CHURCH ALDBOURNE

Charity number: 1102788
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £13.03k £19.21k £12.82k £13.74k £22.30k
Total expenditure £1.86k £4.37k £18.65k £17.27k £10.73k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A