NORFOLK NEIGHBOURHOOD WATCH ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We work holistically with all members of the community in a wide range of settings to promote active citizenship, build community cohesion, reduce social exclusion, prevent anti-social behaviour and promote safer communities. All our activities are undertaken via the relevant District Neighbourhood Watch Associations and we provide support for all the Neighbourhood Watch Schemes within Norfolk.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Norfolk
Governance
- 13 January 2004: Standard registration
- NORFOLK HOME WATCH ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Robert Leslie Rowlands | Chair | 19 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Michael Onassis | Trustee | 14 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Smriti Jha | Trustee | 21 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gary Nurse | Trustee | 26 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
JOHN KENNY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOHN KYNASTON BEBBINGTON F INST SMM | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £520 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £204 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £202 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 03 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 29 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 21 June 2022 | 233 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 3 OCTOBER 2003, AS AMENDED 4TH MARCH 2004. AS AMENDED ON 21 APR 2016 as amended on 09 Aug 2023
Charitable objects
1. TO WORK HOLISTICALLY WITH ALL MEMBERS OF THE COMMUNITY IN A WIDE RANGE OF SETTINGS TO PROMOTE ACTIVE CITIZENSHIP AND A GREATER PUBLIC PARTICIPATION TO BUILD COMMUNITY COHESION, REDUCE SOCIAL EXCLUSION, PREVENT ANTI-SOCIAL BEHAVIOUR AND PROMOTE SAFER COMMUNITIES. 2. THE ASSOCIATION SHALL BE NON PARTY IN POLITICS AND NON SECTARIAN IN RELIGION AND SHALL OPERATE AN EQUAL OPPORTUNITIES POLICY
Area of benefit
NORFOLK
Contact information
- Address:
-
60 Ipswich Road
NORWICH
NR4 6QR
- Phone:
- 07752213981
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
norfolknw@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window