Accounts and annual returns WADHAM COLLEGE

Charity number: 1139726
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2021 26 April 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 26 April 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2020 20 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 20 April 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2019 21 May 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 21 May 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2018 15 March 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 15 March 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2017 14 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 14 March 2018 On time Download Open in new window