Trustees WADHAM COLLEGE

Charity number: 1139726
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

74 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr Lewis Graham Trustee 01 January 2022
None on record
Dr Georgina Gregory Trustee 01 October 2021
None on record
Prof Shazia Choudhry Trustee 01 September 2021
None on record
Dr Evan Easton-Calabria Trustee 01 September 2021
None on record
Robert Hannigan Trustee 01 September 2021
None on record
Dr Katya Hertog Trustee 01 September 2021
None on record
Dr Paul Elliott Trustee 01 September 2021
None on record
Dr Bernhard Staresina Trustee 01 August 2021
None on record
Professor Luis Fernando Alday Trustee 27 November 2020
None on record
Dr Attila Szabo Trustee 01 October 2020
None on record
Dr Sarah Cullinan Herring Trustee 01 October 2020
None on record
Professor Christopher Summerfield Trustee 01 October 2020
None on record
Dr Michael Froggatt Trustee 01 October 2020
None on record
Dr Laura Moody Trustee 01 October 2020
None on record
Dr Lucy McDermott Trustee 01 October 2020
None on record
Dr Molly Grace Trustee 01 September 2020
None on record
Dr Hannah Christensen Trustee 27 July 2020
None on record
Dr Paul Balister Trustee 01 July 2020
None on record
Dr George Southcombe Trustee 01 July 2020
None on record
Professor Francesco Licausi Trustee 27 January 2020
None on record
Dr Natalia Doan Trustee 01 October 2019
None on record
Dr Juliane Zachhuber Trustee 01 September 2019
None on record
Dr Rebecca Simson Trustee 01 September 2019
None on record
Professor Seamus Davis Trustee 25 January 2019
None on record
Dr Fabrizio Caola Trustee 01 January 2019
None on record
Dr Monika Gullerova Trustee 01 January 2018
None on record
Dr ANDREW DAVID FARMERY MA, MD Trustee 01 January 2018
None on record
Dr Emily McLaughlin Trustee 01 September 2017
None on record
Dr Christina Sophia Maria Benninghaus Trustee 01 September 2017
None on record
Dr Stephan Rauschenbach Trustee 01 September 2017
None on record
Oliver Butler Trustee 01 September 2017
None on record
Dr Peter Alsop Trustee 01 October 2016
None on record
Professor Karl Kugle Trustee 01 September 2016
None on record
Professor Sakura Schafer-Nameki Trustee 01 September 2016
None on record
Professor Ursula Martin Trustee 01 January 2016
None on record
Dr Olivia Vasquez-Medina Trustee 01 September 2015
None on record
PROF. FIONA POWRIE Trustee 01 October 2014
None on record
Dr Alexander Steel Trustee 01 September 2014
None on record
Dr Lydia Gilday Trustee 01 September 2014
None on record
Dr Alfonso Castrejon-Pita Trustee 01 October 2013
None on record
prof Ekaterina Shamonina Trustee 01 October 2013
None on record
Dr Thomas Simpson Trustee 01 September 2013
None on record
Dr Thomas Sinclair Trustee 01 September 2013
None on record
Dr DOMINIC BROOKSHAW Trustee 01 September 2013
None on record
JULIE CHRISTIANE HAGE Trustee 02 April 2013
None on record
Dr JANE GRIFFITHS Trustee 24 January 2013
None on record
Professor FRANCESCO ZANETTI Trustee 24 January 2013
None on record
Dr EMMA COHEN Trustee 16 January 2013
None on record
Dr ALEXANDER FRIEDRICH RITTER Trustee 16 January 2013
None on record
Dr MATTHEW KEMPSHALL MA DPHIL Trustee 07 October 2011
None on record
Dr NATHALIE SEDDON Trustee 07 October 2011
None on record
FRANCES LLOYD Trustee 07 October 2011
None on record
Dr Margaret Hillenbrand Trustee 01 September 2009
None on record
PROFESSOR Darren Dixon Trustee 01 October 2008
None on record
PROFESSOR Eric Clarke Trustee 01 October 2007
None on record
Dr Peter Thonemann Trustee 11 September 2007
None on record
PHILIP BULLOCK Trustee 01 September 2007
RUSSIAN LANGUAGE UNDERGRADUATE STUDIES LIMITED
Received: On time
PROFESSOR Edmund Herzig Trustee 01 October 2006
None on record
PROFESSOR Paolo Radaelli Trustee 01 October 2006
None on record
Dr ANKHI MUKHERJEE Trustee 01 September 2006
None on record
Professor Carolin Duttlinger Trustee 01 September 2006
None on record
Dr Mark Thompson Trustee 01 September 2006
None on record
Dr ALEXANDER PASEAU Trustee 01 September 2005
None on record
Dr MARTIN GILLES BUREAU Trustee 01 January 2005
None on record
Dr Michael Bannon Trustee 01 November 2003
None on record
Professor Ben Berks Trustee 01 October 2003
None on record
Dr Caroline Mawson Trustee 25 February 2002
None on record
Dr PAUL MARTIN Trustee 01 October 2001
None on record
Dr OREN SUSSMAN Trustee 01 September 2000
None on record
Dr Claudia Pazos-Alonso Trustee 15 September 1997
None on record
PROFESSOR Paul Beer Trustee 01 October 1990
None on record
Professor Alan Beggs Trustee 01 October 1990
None on record
Professor Stephen Heyworth Trustee 01 October 1988
None on record
Dr Jane Garnett Trustee 01 October 1987
None on record