THE TREE HOUSE OF WATER ORTON PRE-SCHOOL AND OUT OF SCHOOL HOURS CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Child care provider, Pre school and out of School Hours Club
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2020
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 25 March 2004: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JANINE MITCHELL | Trustee | 11 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
Diane Sanders | Trustee | 11 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
CLAIRE ESSEX | Trustee | 11 March 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2016 | 31/07/2017 | 31/07/2018 | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.91k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.35k | £1.07k | £154 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 363 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 363 days | |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 729 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 729 days | |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1094 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1094 days | |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 08 June 2021 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 08 June 2021 | 373 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 17 JUNE 2003 AS AMENDED 24 FEBRUARY 2004
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND DEVELOPMENT OF PRE-SCHOOL CHILDREN. TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR DAILY CARE, RECREATION AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN DURING OUT OF SCHOOL HOURS AND SCHOOL HOLIDAYS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE TREE HOUSE OF WATER ORTON
WATER ORTON PRIMARY SCHOOL
PLANK LANE
WATER ORTON
BIRMINGHAM
B46 1SG
- Phone:
- 01217473923
- Email:
- claireessex@welearn365.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window