Trustees WIGAN MS THERAPY CENTRE LTD
Charity number: 1102646
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Peter Elliott | Chair | 01 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Paul Percy | Trustee | 18 November 2022 |
|
|||||
Ian Chalkley | Trustee | 18 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Chilton | Trustee | 08 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Joanna Hammond | Trustee | 06 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Karen Elliott | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Wendy Welch | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Richard Mather | Trustee | 09 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Janet Mather | Trustee | 09 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
MARTIN READ | Trustee | 01 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
HEATHER READ | Trustee | 09 December 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.