Financial history WESTERTON PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENTS TEACHERS AND FRIENDS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1101613
Charity reporting is overdue by 723 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £9.53k £7.44k £7.41k £10.84k £5.49k
Total expenditure £10.15k £14.52k £14.37k £1.14k £10.44k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A