THE NEWLAND CHRISTIAN TRUST

Charity number: 1101648
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £232.32k £361.11k £432.72k £498.48k £366.35k
Total expenditure £206.30k £156.66k £244.80k £504.08k £334.98k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A