Trustees THE NEWLAND CHRISTIAN TRUST
Charity number: 1101648

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Robert Tearle | Trustee | 09 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Abraham Overvoorde | Trustee | 12 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Tim Mitchell | Trustee | 12 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rev Scott McKay | Trustee | 27 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rev Peter Birnie | Trustee | 27 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Man Kit Wong | Trustee | 29 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
David Martin Andrew Buzza | Trustee | 30 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Gary Shaw | Trustee | 30 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
VIV WHITTON | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.