PRESTON GROUP OF ADVANCED MOTORISTS

Charity number: 1101662
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 03 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 01 April 2021 60 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 18 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 05 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 11 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required