PRESTON GROUP OF ADVANCED MOTORISTS

Charity number: 1101662
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £244 £143 £75 £25 £15
Total expenditure £363 £0 £1.07k £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A