Financial history ST JOHNS AND ST CLEMENTS PTFA

Charity number: 1102196
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 04/10/2017 04/10/2018 04/10/2019 04/10/2020 04/10/2021
Total gross income £15.00k £16.79k £18.94k £6.92k £6.44k
Total expenditure £4.00k £19.51k £24.84k £2.12k £8.32k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A