ST. MARY'S JUNIOR SCHOOL, CAMBRIDGE, PTA

Charity number: 1101729
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2020 09 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2019 19 June 2020 19 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2018 19 January 2020 233 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2017 18 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2016 18 September 2017 110 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2016 Not Required