Financial history OAKWOOD ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1102222
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021
Total gross income £24.63k £18.58k £18.03k £18.38k £9.36k
Total expenditure £11.26k £4.81k £47.48k £17.56k £7.61k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A