NAVAL & MILITARY BIBLE SOCIETY LTD

Charity number: 1102593
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £129.85k £82.27k £72.60k £151.05k £179.02k
Total expenditure £81.02k £115.96k £75.65k £144.55k £149.64k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A