NAVAL & MILITARY BIBLE SOCIETY LTD

Charity number: 1102593
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
STUART ROSS RIVERS Trustee 10 February 2017 None on record
DR Philip Andrew Lucas Trustee 06 October 2016 None on record
LIEUTENANT COLONEL DENNIS GEORGE VINCENT MBE Trustee 25 February 2016
THE ESSEX REGIMENT MUSEUM Received: On time
Rev Simon Paul Springett MA Chair 16 May 2016
FRONT LINE NAVAL CHAPLAINS Received: On time
COLONEL John William Lewis Trustee
SOLDIERS' AND AIRMEN'S SCRIPTURE READERS ASSOCIATION Received: On time
THOMAS HARRIS FUND Received: On time
THE KINGHAM HILL TRUST Received: On time
REV Karen Louise Bassett Trustee 30 June 2017 None on record
Rev JAMES PITKIN Trustee 11 June 2014 None on record