Financial history UNITED THROUGH SPORT

Charity number: 1102107
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £144.13k £222.70k £229.25k £240.90k £101.96k
Total expenditure £129.81k £228.50k £221.04k £255.76k £105.71k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A £9.80k