Accounts and annual returns ST JOSEPH'S SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER AND FRIENDS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1102193
Charity reporting is overdue by 461 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 Overdue Overdue by 96 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Overdue Overdue by 96 days
Annual return 31 August 2020 Overdue Overdue by 461 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Overdue Overdue by 461 days
Annual return 31 August 2019 31 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 31 January 2020 215 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 22 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required