Accounts and annual returns ST PHILIP'S CE (A) PRIMARY SCHOOL PTA

Charity number: 1101828
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2021 07 December 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2020 08 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2019 20 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2018 13 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2017 10 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 Not Required