Accounts and annual returns RURAL COMMUNITY RESPONDERS

Charity number: 1103206
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2022 09 June 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2021 12 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2020 22 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2019 26 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2018 01 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2018 Not Required