ST LUKES PRE-SCHOOL (ROCHESTER)

Charity number: 1102167
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 05 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 05 March 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 05 March 2020 126 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 05 March 2020 126 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 20 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 20 September 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 14 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 14 September 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 27 September 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 29 September 2016 On time Download