ST LUKES PRE-SCHOOL (ROCHESTER)

Charity number: 1102167
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £61.38k £55.81k £87.52k £79.82k £81.47k
Total expenditure £60.88k £66.47k £65.72k £73.71k £75.41k
Income from government contracts £0 £40.46k £71.03k £67.68k £60.14k
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A