Accounts and annual returns AMANDA FLACK FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1103685
Charity is insolvent
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2023 Overdue Overdue by 105 days
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2023 Overdue Overdue by 105 days
Annual return 30 April 2022
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2022
Annual return 30 April 2021
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2021
Annual return 30 April 2020
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020
Annual return 30 April 2019
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2019