Accounts and annual returns ST BARTHOLOMEW'S PTA

Charity number: 1102182
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 20 February 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 11 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 11 November 2020 134 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 08 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 25 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required