Financial history ST BARTHOLOMEW'S PTA

Charity number: 1102182
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £17.11k £18.45k £9.83k £5.04k £6.27k
Total expenditure £12.37k £14.04k £3.88k £5.35k £8.54k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A