Financial history THE ASSOCIATION OF THE POLISH KNIGHTS OF MALTA (UK)

Charity number: 1102122
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £33.93k £19.14k £15.53k £26.03k £114.99k
Total expenditure £36.49k £17.19k £14.37k £7.50k £52.75k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A