SOCIAL LIFE OPPORTUNITIES (SOLO)

Charity Number: 1102297
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Provision of leisure/social activities for children/adults with learning disabilities living within Solihull or the surrounding areas. Provision of respite to the parents/carers of children and adults with learning disabilites receiving our leisure services. Support to other local organisations providing services to children/adults with LD. Provision of volunteering opportunities.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Disability
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Birmingham City
  • Solihull
  • Warwickshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 25 February 2004: Standard registration
  • 13 July 2015: Funds received from 1112029 TIMEOUT SATURDAY CLUB
  • 28 September 2021: Funds received from 1143869 SOLIHULL AUTISTIC SPECTRUM SUPPORT AND INFORMATION
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • SOLO (Working name)
  • SOLIHULL LEISURE OPPORTUNITIES (Previous name)
  • SOLIHULL LIFE OPPORTUNITIES (Previous name)
  • SOLO LIFE OPPORTUNITIES (Previous name)
  • SOLO LIFE OPPORTUNITIES (SOLO) (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Care Quality Commission
  • Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JAN PRIOR Chair
None on record
Zuzana Fitzpatrick Vesela Trustee 25 September 2024
None on record
Stephanie Jackson Trustee 25 September 2024
None on record
Jayne Elizabeth Hume Trustee 26 April 2023
None on record
Rehana Begum Trustee 26 May 2021
None on record
Andrew Gilyead Trustee 06 September 2017
None on record
Paul Beech Trustee 11 January 2016
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £2.35m £2.19m £2.03m £2.15m £2.25m
Total expenditure £2.42m £2.18m £2.00m £2.13m £2.25m
Income from government contracts £321.32k N/A £427.24k £303.76k £292.41k
Income from government grants N/A £689.94k £427.24k £44.30k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £60.99k £31.77k £20.70k £12.30k £5.01k
Income - Other trading activities £50.83k £13.40k £19.96k £22.86k £13.68k
Income - Charitable activities £2.24m £1.58m £1.99m £2.11m £2.23m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.22k £1.20k £2.41k £794 £1.42k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.41m £2.18m £2.00m £2.13m £2.24m
Expenditure - Raising funds £6.69k £5.69k £5.87k £7.78k £7.81k
Expenditure - Governance £7.86k £14.12k £10.17k £9.13k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Own use assets £322.96k £294.62k £270.34k £276.48k £290.42k
Long-term investments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Other assets £477.86k £553.51k £548.85k £499.48k £523.44k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £221.44k £260.24k £199.98k £142.04k £177.07k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 21 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 21 November 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 07 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 07 December 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 13 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 13 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 02 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 06 December 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 16 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 16 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
38 Walnut Close
Chelmsley Wood
BIRMINGHAM
B37 7PU
Phone:
01217793865