FRIENDS OF BRADFORD YOUTH PLAYERS

Charity number: 1102702
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 02 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 06 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 30 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 17 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 21 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required