Crofton Partnership

Charity number: 1101987
Charity reporting is overdue by 156 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 Overdue Overdue by 156 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Overdue Overdue by 156 days
Annual return 31 August 2019 06 October 2020 98 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 09 July 2019 9 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 24 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2016 12 June 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 Not Required