SOUTHERN AFRICAN CHILDREN AND FAMILY WELFARE ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1103088
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2020 08 June 2021 8 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2019 30 March 2021 303 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2018 12 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2017 12 September 2018 104 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2016 24 August 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2016 Not Required