Birmingham Newman University

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Birmingham Newman University provides higher education courses at foundation, undergraduate and postgraduate degree level. It is a generalist university with a specialism in teacher training.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
Total income:
£25,204,463
Donations and legacies | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £25.02m | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £181.64k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£25,011,023
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £25.01m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £1,211,161 from 6 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £25.01m | |
Retained for future use | £193.44k |
People

293 Employee(s)
16 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England
Governance
- 06 July 2005: Standard registration
- NEWMAN HEALTH & WELLBEING COUNSELLING & PSYCHOTHERAPY (Working name)
- NEWMAN COLLEGE (Previous name)
- NEWMAN COLLEGE OF HIGHER EDUCATION (Previous name)
- NEWMAN UNIVERSITY (Previous name)
- NEWMAN UNIVERSITY COLLEGE (Previous name)
- Financial Conduct Authority
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Professor Martin Dominic Stringer | Chair | 01 January 2024 |
|
|||||||||||||
Alexander Fisher | Trustee | 27 March 2025 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Peter O'Hagan | Trustee | 27 March 2025 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Kristin Irene Allen O'Donnell | Trustee | 26 September 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Martin Paul David McNeill | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Michael Diiorio | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Dr Katherine Emma Birch | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Christopher George Leigh | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Laila Iftikhar-Ali | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Joanne Beulah Hill | Trustee | 04 October 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Professor Antony Christopher Harris | Trustee | 22 June 2022 |
|
|||||||||||||
Dr Jose Angel Garcia Velazquez | Trustee | 22 June 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Professor Jacquelyn Dunne | Trustee | 01 March 2020 |
|
|||||||||||||
KARAN DIEDRE GILMORE | Trustee | 26 July 2018 |
|
|||||||||||||
Gayle Elizabeth Ditchburn | Trustee | 22 June 2017 |
|
|
||||||||||||
The Most Reverend Bernard Longley | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.31m | £23.79m | £24.12m | £24.37m | £25.20m | |
|
Total expenditure | £22.59m | £23.37m | £22.09m | £23.95m | £25.01m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.18m | £1.03m | £1.13m | £1.30m | £1.21m | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £24.27m | £23.76m | £24.12m | £24.36m | £25.02m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £31.85k | £26.70k | £5.03k | £6.82k | £181.64k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £22.59m | £23.37m | £22.09m | £23.95m | £25.01m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £51.64k | £43.62k | £17.73k | £48.66k | £69.02k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £36.52m | £35.58m | £34.75m | £36.45m | £36.59m | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £8.29m | £9.68m | £12.55m | £13.31m | £13.61m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £8.50m | £8.54m | £8.53m | £10.58m | £10.82m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 24 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 24 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 21 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 21 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 28 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 28 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 28 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 July 2020
(These accounts |
28 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 26 June 2020 | 26 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 26 June 2020 | 26 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 28/06/2005 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 09/01/2008 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 11/02/2013 as amended on 03 Oct 2019 as amended on 02 Aug 2023
Charitable objects
THE CONDUCT OF A ROMAN CATHOLIC COLLEGE OF HIGHER EDUCATION FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, LEARNING AND RESEARCH FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE. WEST MIDLANDS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Birmingham Newman University
Genners Lane
Birmingham
B32 3NT
- Phone:
- 0121 4761181
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window