Trustees Birmingham Newman University

Charity number: 1110346
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

19 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Professor Margaret Ann House Chair 01 January 2022
None on record
Professor Martin Dominic Stringer Trustee 01 January 2024
THE KING'S SCHOOL WORCESTER
Received: On time
Martin Paul David McNeill Trustee 01 January 2024
None on record
Michael Diiorio Trustee 01 January 2024
None on record
Rowland Agidee Trustee 01 January 2024
None on record
Dr Katherine Emma Birch Trustee 01 January 2024
None on record
Christopher George Leigh Trustee 01 January 2024
None on record
Laila Iftikhar-Ali Trustee 01 January 2024
None on record
Joanne Beulah Hill Trustee 04 October 2023
None on record
Zoe Harrison Trustee 01 July 2022
None on record
Professor Antony Christopher Harris Trustee 22 June 2022
BRENT MUSIC ACADEMY
Recently registered
Dr Jose Angel Garcia Velazquez Trustee 22 June 2022
None on record
Professor Jacquelyn Dunne Trustee 01 March 2020
GUILDHE LIMITED
Overdue by 16 days
Leoarna Kim Mathias Trustee 30 April 2019
None on record
KARAN DIEDRE GILMORE Trustee 26 July 2018
THE BLUE COAT SCHOOL BIRMINGHAM LIMITED
Received: On time
Gayle Elizabeth Ditchburn Trustee 22 June 2017
None on record
Phillip Lennon Trustee 21 April 2016
BASILDON, BILLERICAY AND WICKFORD COUNCIL FOR VOLUNTARY SERVICE
Received: On time
DEIRDRE FINUCANE Trustee 19 February 2015
None on record
The Most Reverend Bernard Longley Trustee
CATHOLIC TRUST FOR ENGLAND AND WALES
Received: On time
MATER ECCLESIAE COLLEGE
Received: On time
BIRMINGHAM CHURCHES TOGETHER
Received: On time
THE BRITISH TRUST FOR THE ECUMENICAL INSTITUTE FOR ADVANCED THEOLOGICAL STUDY IN JERUSALEM
Received: 31 days late
MARYVALE INSTITUTE
Overdue by 16 days
BIRMINGHAM DIOCESAN TRUST
Received: On time