Financial history M. T. O. COLLEGE

Charity number: 1102521
Charity reporting is up to date (24 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021
Total gross income £11.05k £22.65k £42.98k £29.77k £11.90k
Total expenditure £11.90k £19.53k £44.62k £39.25k £39.60k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A