Accounts and annual returns CATHOLIC BLIND INSTITUTE
Charity number: 1102657

Charity reporting is up to date (164 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 14 July 2023 | 164 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 14 July 2023 | 164 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 02 November 2021 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 04 November 2021 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 October 2020 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 30 October 2020 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 03 December 2019 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | 03 December 2019 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 19 October 2018 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | 19 October 2018 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window