Trustees CATHOLIC BLIND INSTITUTE
Charity number: 1102657
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Peter Halpin | Trustee | 25 March 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Robin Edward Robinson FCA | Trustee | 18 December 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Angela O'Brien | Trustee | 25 September 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Sister Theresa Tighe Sr | Trustee | 12 December 2022 |
|
|||||||
Bernadette Buckle | Trustee | 14 November 2022 |
|
|
||||||
ALAM NAWAZ | Trustee | 20 June 2022 |
|
|
||||||
William Tudor Mansel Roberts | Trustee | 08 November 2021 |
|
|||||||
Roger Nelson Phillips | Trustee | 08 November 2021 |
|
|||||||
Geraldine Amy Bounds | Trustee | 08 November 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Stephen WINSTANLEY | Trustee | 14 March 2016 |
|
|
||||||
MARTIN GERARD O'ROURKE | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.