Financial history THE BRITISH PAIN SOCIETY

Charity number: 1103260
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £545.82k £375.56k £510.42k £396.47k £311.26k
Total expenditure £619.06k £529.56k £539.28k £280.77k £297.91k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £175.87k N/A £154.01k N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £88.59k N/A £108.14k N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £276.28k N/A £244.72k N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £0 N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income - Investment £5.07k N/A £3.55k N/A N/A
Income - Other £0 N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £0 N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £570.57k N/A £496.60k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £5.71k N/A £21.54k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £15.00k N/A £24.86k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £48.49k N/A £42.68k N/A N/A