Trustees THE BRITISH PAIN SOCIETY
Charity number: 1103260

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Arun Bhaskar | Chair | 30 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
Dr Sumit Gulati | Trustee | 15 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Tacson Fernandez | Trustee | 09 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Celia Anne Manson | Trustee | 29 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Amelia Swift | Trustee | 02 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Martin Stephen Hey | Trustee | 02 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Ramanarayanan Krishnamoorthy | Trustee | 01 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr Neil Talbert Collighan | Trustee | 01 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr Ashish Pralhad Gulve | Trustee | 01 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr David Pang | Trustee | 01 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr Ayman Eissa | Trustee | 04 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Professor Roger David Knaggs | Trustee | 22 April 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.