THE RV E & H MOON CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Lancashire area, mainly Pilling and surrounding areas
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Lancashire
Governance
- 19 March 2004: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CAROLINE ELIZABETH FISH | Trustee | 05 October 2022 |
|
|
||||||
CHRISTOPHER JOHN SUMNER | Trustee | 05 October 2022 |
|
|
||||||
John David George Hinchliffe | Trustee | 03 December 2015 |
|
|||||||
MATTHEW PRENTICE | Trustee | 13 November 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £32.61k | £25.92k | £24.68k | £26.76k | £27.94k | |
|
Total expenditure | £35.66k | £35.25k | £35.52k | £33.50k | £29.91k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 11 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 11 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 17 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 17 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 02 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 04 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 04 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 17 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 17 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
WILL PROVED AT LIVERPOOL PROBATE REGISTRY ON 13 FEBRUARY 2003
Charitable objects
SUBJECT TO THE PAYMENT FROM IT OF ALL PROPER COSTS AND EXPENSES IN ADMINISTERING THE CHARITABLE TRUST MY TRUSTEES SHALL AT SUCH TIME OR TIMES AND IN SUCH MANNER IN ALL RESPECTS AS THEY SHALL THINK FIT APPLY THE INCOME AND THE CAPITAL OF THE CHARITABLE TRUST IN OR TOWARDS THE FURTHERANCE OF SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSE OR OBJECTS AND IF MORE THAN ONE IN SUCH PROPORTIONS AS MY TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE OVER WYRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Vincents Solicitors
21-23 Park Street
LYTHAM ST. ANNES
Lancashire
FY8 5LU
- Phone:
- 01253 773377
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window