Financial history THE STRATFIELD MORTIMER FAIR GROUND CHARITY

Charity number: 1110521
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £2.00k £2.00k £2.03k £5.66k £2.73k
Total expenditure £58 £0 £4.70k £3.51k £3.50k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A