BOMBALI DISTRICT DEVELOPMENT ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
organise fund raising activities within the uk.conduct general monthly meetings to discuss issues affecting Sierra Leonean communities in the uk and back home in sierra leone.proceeds raised go towards relieving poverty and ease suffering of deprived people in third world conntries
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 28 November 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Cardiff
- East Sussex
- Essex
- Kent
- Manchester City
- Milton Keynes
- Oxfordshire
- Reading
- West Sussex
- Sierra Leone
Governance
- 05 March 2004: Standard registration
- BODDA (Working name)
- Care Inspectorate Wales (CIW)
- Financial Conduct Authority
- Homes England
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Chair Person | Chair | 13 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
ABU BAKAR KAMARA | Trustee | 13 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
Dep Chair | Trustee | 13 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
Dep Fin Sec | Trustee | 13 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
Financial secretery | Trustee | 13 April 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 28/11/2019 | 28/11/2020 | 28/11/2021 | 28/11/2022 | 28/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.87k | £2.59k | £4.50k | £1.01k | £485 | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.93k | £1.13k | £4.00k | £539 | £117 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 28 November 2023 | 01 October 2024 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 November 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 November 2022 | 20 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 November 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 November 2021 | 04 October 2022 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 November 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 November 2020 | 03 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 November 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 November 2019 | 16 October 2020 | 18 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 November 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION DATED 28 NOVEMBER 2003.
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE POVERTY, EASE SUFFERING OF DEPRIVED PERSONS AND THOSE AFFECTED BY CIVIL WARS AND NATURAL DISASTERS WHO ARE IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND THE THIRD WORLD COUNTRIES BY PROVIDING HUMANITARIAN SUPPORT, ADVICE TRAINING TO ENABLE THEM IMPROVE THEMSELVES AND PARTICIPATE IN THE SOCIO-ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND THEIR SOCIETIES.
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM AND THIRD WORLD COUNTRIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
20 CARISBROOKE GARDENS
LONDON
SE15 6JS
- Phone:
- 07780691682
- Email:
- kadilakuk@yahoo.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window