ST TERESA'S SCHOOL PTA

Charity number: 1102310
Charity reporting is up to date (69 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 07 September 2021 69 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 06 April 2021 280 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 04 July 2019 4 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 05 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2016 01 August 2017 32 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 Not Required