ST TERESA'S SCHOOL PTA

Charity number: 1102310
Charity reporting is up to date (69 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £18.80k £22.18k £20.10k £23.66k £16.55k
Total expenditure £23.57k £18.28k £26.54k £8.99k £26.73k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A