REFUGEE COUNSELLING PROJECT

Charity number: 1104588
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 09 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 17 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 24 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 19 February 2018 19 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 19 July 2017 169 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required