REFUGEE COUNSELLING PROJECT

Charity number: 1104588
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £830 £1.08k £2.00k £3.58k £3.06k
Total expenditure £810 £900 £1.91k £3.56k £2.95k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A