SOUTH WEST LONDON LAW CENTRES

Charity number: 1102433
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Sarmad Mehmood Qureshi Trustee 20 February 2020 None on record
john william linwood Trustee 06 May 2014 None on record
Olivier Emmanuel Jean Marie Ribert Trustee 11 February 2019 None on record
Claire Marianne Gilbert Trustee 11 February 2019 None on record
Clara Clint Trustee 06 June 2016 None on record
SARAH ANN TOWLER Trustee 06 May 2014 None on record
Simon Tinkler Trustee 18 December 2019 None on record
Marion Frances Edge Trustee 21 July 2015 None on record
ALLAN BLAKE Chair 03 December 2018
THE OPEN UNIVERSITY STUDENTS ASSOCIATION Received: On time
Ranil De Silva Trustee 20 February 2020 None on record