THE BRITISH FRIENDS OF ZICHRON MENACHEM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The relief of sickness and particularly by assisting young cancer patients and their families.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
- Israel
Governance
- 12 March 2004: Standard registration
- ZICHRON MENACHEM (Working name)
- ZUM ZUM (Working name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Wayne Salkinder | Trustee | 09 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
BRIAN LEON RESNICK | Trustee | 21 January 2004 |
|
|
||||
ELI SELIGER | Trustee | 21 January 2004 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT D GREEN | Trustee | 21 January 2004 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £296.39k | £151.02k | £119.66k | £141.50k | £156.91k | |
|
Total expenditure | £398.49k | £84.61k | £231.37k | £71.69k | £92.73k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £5.33k | £1.33k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 18 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 18 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST EXECUTED ON 21ST JANUARY 2004.
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS PARTICULARLY BY SUPPORTING CHILDREN AND THEIR FAMILIES THROUGH SICKNESS AND PARTICULARLY IN RELATION TO JEWISH CHILDREN SUFFERING AGAINST CANCER.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
30 BROOKSIDE ROAD
LONDON
NW11 9NE
- Phone:
- 02087318150
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window