Accounts and annual returns ASSOCIATION OF FRIENDS OF ST JOSEPH'S, DOVERCOURT

Charity number: 1102272
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 14 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 23 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 14 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 08 January 2020 192 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 18 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required