Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF ST PAUL'S SCHOOL, ALWOODLEY

Charity number: 1102434
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 12 September 2022 74 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 04 December 2021 157 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 11 May 2021 315 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 27 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 27 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required