Financial history MARY SEACOLE TRUST

Charity number: 1103862
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £7.06k £1.90k £7.99k £15.39k £9.92k
Total expenditure £40.05k £7.18k £20.66k £7.64k £7.62k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A