Trustees MARY SEACOLE TRUST

Charity number: 1103862
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Trevor David Sterling Chair 02 March 2016
None on record
Charmaine Angela Case Trustee 10 April 2024
None on record
Elizabeth Pearson Trustee 10 April 2024
None on record
Felicia Kwaku OBE Trustee 14 September 2022
None on record
Sophie Winstanley Trustee 14 September 2022
None on record
Dr Habib Naqvi Trustee 09 September 2020
SOMERSET CRICKET FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Jean Dora Gray Trustee 12 April 2017
None on record
Jermaine Daniel Sterling Trustee 11 January 2017
None on record
Dr David Charles Bates Trustee 21 October 2015
HUMANITARIAN AID RELIEF TRUST
Received: On time
ACTION FOR CHILDREN OF AGAGO
Overdue by 45 days
DAWN HILL CBE Trustee
None on record